OK SB385 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB385

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain samples of beer, wine and spirits in retail spirit licensee premises. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain samples of beer, wine and spirits in retail spirit licensee premises. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07SenateApproved by Governor 05/07/2021
2021-05-04SenateSent to Governor
2021-05-04HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-05-04SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-05-03SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-05-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 7
2021-05-03SenateHAs adopted
2021-04-26SenateHAs read
2021-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 22
2021-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-08HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2021-04-08HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
2021-03-03HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-03SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-02SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
2021-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2021-02-04SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateCoauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Coleman
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB385 (Carry Over) 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb385&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB385%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB385%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB385%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB385%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB385%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB385%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB385%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB385%20(2-22-21)%20(COLEMAN)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB385%20FULLAMD1%20JUDD%20STROM-JL.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB385%20FULLAMD2%20JUDD%20STROM-JL.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB385%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB385%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB385%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB385%20FULLAMD1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB385%20FULLAMD2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB385%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB385%20HASB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB385_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB385_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback