OK SB38 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB38
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fines and fees; Forensic Science Improvement Revolving Fund; fees. Effective date.
Title
Fines and fees; Forensic Science Improvement Revolving Fund; fees. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 32 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB38 (Carry Over) 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017