OK SB357 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Rural water districts; releasing lands from districts; modifying process.
Title
Rural water districts; releasing lands from districts; modifying process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |