OK SB346 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; directing the State Department of Health to maintain an advance directives registry. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; directing the State Department of Health to maintain an advance directives registry. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-15 - House - House: (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Approved by Governor 05/21/2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-15 | To Senate | |
2009-05-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught | |
2009-05-15 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-13 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2009-05-13 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance), Garrison | |
2009-05-13 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-12 | Title restored | |
2009-05-12 | CCR read | |
2009-04-30 | Conference granted, HC's named Ritze, Kern, Jones, Reynolds, Steele, Key, Proctor, Dorman, Miller, Carey, Glenn | |
2009-04-30 | SCs named GCCA | |
2009-04-22 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-21 | HAs read | |
2009-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 14 | |
2009-04-20 | General Order | |
2009-04-13 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-18 | coauthored by Ritze (principal House author) | |
2009-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Ritze | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-04 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 3102 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3102 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3102 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |