OK SB325 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - coauthored by Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - coauthored by Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; authorizing municipalities to create registry of rental properties. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; authorizing municipalities to create registry of rental properties. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Halligan |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |