OK SB310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB310
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Youthful offenders; prohibiting youthful offender status for person charged with certain crimes. Effective date.
Title
Youthful offenders; prohibiting youthful offender status for person charged with certain crimes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Mike Dobrinski [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Sen. John Montgomery [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 9 |
2021-04-14 | House | Amended |
2021-04-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dobrinski |
2021-04-14 | House | General Order |
2021-03-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Montgomery |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB310 (Carry Over) 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021