OK SB276 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-23 - coauthored by Thompson (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-23 - coauthored by Thompson (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating the Fair Practices of Equipment Manufacturers, Distributors, Wholesalers and Dealers Act. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating the Fair Practices of Equipment Manufacturers, Distributors, Wholesalers and Dealers Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Thompson (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Bingman | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-20 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Thompson | |
2009-02-10 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Bingman | |
2009-02-10 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Gumm | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 16 | 1000 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 16 | 1014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb276&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb276_int.rtf |