OK SB268 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB268
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; modifying quorum requirement for virtual charter schools.
Title
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; modifying quorum requirement for virtual charter schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 29; Ayes: 66 Nays: 24 |
2019-04-16 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB268 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019