OK SB263 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; CLEET powers and duties; continuing education. Effective date.
Title
Schools; CLEET powers and duties; continuing education. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor 04/06/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-03-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-30 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-30 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |