OK SB261 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB261
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student loans; creating the Oklahoma Student Borrower's Bill of Rights Act. Effective date.
Title
Student loans; creating the Oklahoma Student Borrower's Bill of Rights Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Thomas Marti [R] |
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Bush |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-03-30 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Phillips |
2021-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Provenzano (principal House author) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB261 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021