OK SB260 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Intractable Pain Treatment Act. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Intractable Pain Treatment Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carey [D] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | |
2009-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-09 | coauthored by Carey (principal House author) | |
2009-02-09 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-09 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Carey | |
2009-02-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Resources | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Gumm | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |