OK SB255 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating definition of autocycle; stating registration and exception. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating definition of autocycle; stating registration and exception. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion expired |
2015-04-13 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Biggs |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 |
2015-04-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-04-13 | House | General Order |
2015-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Cleveland (principal House author) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Finance Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Barrington |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |