OK SB243 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Seismic exploration. Emergency.
Title
Seismic exploration. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Approved by Governor 05/09/2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-08 | To Senate | |
2012-05-08 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Cooksey | |
2012-05-08 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-07 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2012-05-07 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-07 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-03 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-03 | Enacting clause restored | |
2012-05-03 | Title restored | |
2012-05-03 | 2 CCR read | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-05-02 | SCs named Branan, Johnson (Rob), Marlatt, Schulz, Ivester, Bass | |
2012-05-02 | HAs rejected, further conference requested | |
2011-05-19 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2011-05-13 | SCs named Branan, Johnson (Rob), Marlatt, Holt, Paddack, Bass | |
2011-05-11 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-05-10 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-26 | HAs read | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 32; Ayes: 42 Nays: 34 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-04-12 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Trebilcock (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Branan | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |