OK SB225 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Railroads; limiting space where railroad crossing construction is required. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroads; limiting space where railroad crossing construction is required. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseRemove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Rules
2019-04-10HouseWithdrawn from Transportation Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback