OK SB225 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Railroads; limiting space where railroad crossing construction is required. Effective date.
Title
Railroads; limiting space where railroad crossing construction is required. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB225 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall