OK SB207 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Approved by Governor 04/08/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Approved by Governor 04/08/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying the frequency of evaluating certain teachers. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying the frequency of evaluating certain teachers. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ford [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/08/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 15 |
2013-04-02 | House | General Order |
2013-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Coody (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |