OK SB2024 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; modifying name of certain act relating to carbon sequestration activities. Emergency.
Title
Environment and natural resources; modifying name of certain act relating to carbon sequestration activities. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Sen. David Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-02 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Energy and Environment | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Myers | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |