OK SB2017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Local Development and Enterprise Zone Incentive Leverage Act; prescribing reporting requirements and availability of reports. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Local Development and Enterprise Zone Incentive Leverage Act; prescribing reporting requirements and availability of reports. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-23 | House | General Order |
2024-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |