OK SB1989 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; creating the Popular Culture Museum. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; creating the Popular Culture Museum. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | |
2012-05-23 | First Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 22 | |
2012-05-23 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | Remove as author Senator Jolley; authored by Senator Bingman | |
2012-05-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | |
2012-05-21 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-05-18 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) | |
2012-05-18 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2012-05-18 | coauthored by Justice | |
2012-05-18 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-05-18 | First Reading |