OK SB1968 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Ayes: 16 Nays: 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Ayes: 16 Nays: 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Native American Cultural and Educational Authority transferring to Tourism and Recreation Department. Effective Date.
Title
Native American Cultural and Educational Authority transferring to Tourism and Recreation Department. Effective Date.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] |
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT JCR (Y: 16 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Ayes: 16 Nays: 72 | |
2012-05-24 | JCR failed of adoption | |
2012-05-24 | General Order | |
2012-05-23 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | |
2012-05-22 | First Reading | |
2012-05-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-22 | coauthored by Treat, Shortey | |
2012-05-22 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | |
2012-05-09 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Justice | |
2012-05-08 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-05-08 | First Reading |