OK SB1922 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating new requirements and issuing process for temporary license plates. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating new requirements and issuing process for temporary license plates. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-27 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Haste |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |