OK SB1915 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; allowing for licenses to produce food products from home. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; allowing for licenses to produce food products from home. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 62 |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-03-26 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-26 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Shaw, Garrison |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 5 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1440 | New Code | See Bill Text |