OK SB1870 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; repealing provision related to qualifications.
Title
Commissioner of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; repealing provision related to qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Emergency added |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Murdock |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |