OK SB1858 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Conference granted, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Conference granted, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tax credit; income tax credit for qualified employee in hydrogen manufacturing industry. Effective date.
Title
Tax credit; income tax credit for qualified employee in hydrogen manufacturing industry. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2022-05-04 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2022-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 20 |
2022-04-19 | House | General Order |
2022-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Montgomery |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |