OK SB1709 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Remove as coauthor Senator Dossett (J.J.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Remove as coauthor Senator Dossett (J.J.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fish and wildlife; providing for certain breeding; removing certain fee structure. Effective date.
Title
Fish and wildlife; providing for certain breeding; removing certain fee structure. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. Tom Dugger [R] | Sen. Roland Pederson [R] |
Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: FAILED (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Dossett (J.J.) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Wildlife |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |