OK SB1677 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Children's Code; prohibiting certain actions by the Department of Human Services; authorizing certain claim. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Children's Code; prohibiting certain actions by the Department of Human Services; authorizing certain claim. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Danny Williams [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Sen. Roland Pederson [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: State Powers Committee: E DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: State Powers Committee: E DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: State Powers Committee: E DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: State Powers Committee: E DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2024-05-16 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on States Powers |
2024-05-07 | Senate | SCs named Daniels, Rosino, Haste, Gollihare, Stanley, Young |
2024-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Williams |
2024-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 17 |
2024-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2024-04-23 | House | General Order |
2024-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson, Bullard |
2024-04-04 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, State Powers Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to State Powers |
2024-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |