OK SB1672 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - Coauthored by Representative Williams
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - Coauthored by Representative Williams
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial retirement; creating the Oklahoma Judicial Retirement Act of 2024; mandating retirement of certain judicial officers upon certain age. Emergency.
Title
Judicial retirement; creating the Oklahoma Judicial Retirement Act of 2024; mandating retirement of certain judicial officers upon certain age. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Williams |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |