OK SB163 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB163
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sex Offender Registration Act; modifying required notification. Effective date.
Title
Sex Offender Registration Act; modifying required notification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Ben Loring [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Loring (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB163 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019