OK SB162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; broadening physicians who may sign application. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; broadening physicians who may sign application. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateApproved by Governor 05/07/2019
2019-05-02SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-02HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-01SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-01SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
2019-05-01SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 4
2019-04-23HouseEmergency added
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-23HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
2019-03-13SenateTitle restored
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2019-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb162&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB162%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB162%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB162%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB162%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB162%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB162%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB162_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB162_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback