OK SB1604 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 76-29)
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 76-29)
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health; creating Oklahoma Veterans Traumatic Brain Injury Treatment and Recovery Plan Act of 2014; revolving fund; providing for treatment. Effective date.
Title
Public health; creating Oklahoma Veterans Traumatic Brain Injury Treatment and Recovery Plan Act of 2014; revolving fund; providing for treatment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Health and Social Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Health and Social Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-17 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2014-04-17 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Simpson |
2014-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Hardin, Denney, Kern |
2014-04-10 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |