OK SB1576 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Corporation Commission; prohibiting construction of wind facilities; providing exception to prohibition. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporation Commission; prohibiting construction of wind facilities; providing exception to prohibition. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateApproved by Governor 05/02/2018
2018-04-26SenateSent to Governor
2018-04-26HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-04-26SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-04-25SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-04-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2018-04-25SenateHAs adopted
2018-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2018-04-19SenateHAs read
2018-04-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
2018-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-03-05SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2018-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2018-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative Ortega (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Schulz
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1716020New CodeSee Bill Text
1716021New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1576&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1576%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1576%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB1576%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB1576%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1576%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB1576%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1576%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB1576%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1576_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1576_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback