OK SB1567 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Vetoed 04/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Vetoed 04/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health information; creating the Transparency in Disclosure of Health Information Act. Effective date.
Title
Health information; creating the Transparency in Disclosure of Health Information Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Vetoed 04/13/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Veto message read |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-31 | House | General Order |
2016-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-01 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 2503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2505 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 7100 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 7100 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |