OK SB154 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public trusts; modifying Public Competitive Bidding Act of 1974. Emergency.
Title
Public trusts; modifying Public Competitive Bidding Act of 1974. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Glen Mulready [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |