OK SB1524 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-29)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Memorial highway designations; designating various memorial highways and bridges. Effective Date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial highway designations; designating various memorial highways and bridges. Effective Date.

Sponsors

Rep. Don Armes [R]Sen. Randy Bass [D]Rep. Dale DeWitt [R]Rep. Gus Blackwell [R]
Rep. Joe Dorman [D]Rep. Rebecca Hamilton [D]Sen. Jim Reynolds [R]Rep. John Trebilcock [R]
Rep. Pam Peterson [R]Rep. Gary Banz [R]Rep. Lisa Billy [R]Sen. Bill Brown [R]
Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Marian Cooksey [R]Rep. Doug Cox [R]Rep. Lee Denney [R]
Rep. Larry Glenn [D]Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R]Rep. Michael Jackson [R]Rep. Sally Kern [R]
Rep. Steve Martin [R]Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D]Rep. Jerry McPeak [D]Rep. Richard Morrissette [D]
Rep. Raymond Pruett [D]Rep. Wade Rousselot [D]Rep. Mike Shelton [D]Rep. Ben Sherrer [D]
Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D]Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R]Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]Rep. David Dank [R]
Rep. David Derby [R]Rep. John Enns [R]Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]Rep. Scott Inman [D]
Sen. Rob Johnson [R]Rep. Fred Jordan [R]Rep. Charles Joyner [R]Rep. Scott Martin [R]
Rep. Mark McCullough [R]Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]Rep. Skye McNiel [R]Rep. Jason Murphey [R]
Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]Rep. Eric Proctor [D]Rep. Brian Renegar [D]
Rep. Michael Schwartz [R]Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]
Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]Rep. Cory Williams [D]Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]
Rep. Charles Ortega [R]Rep. Harold Wright [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Rep. Seneca Scott [D]
Rep. Dan Kirby [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]Rep. Jason Nelson [R]Rep. Mike Christian [R]
Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Todd Russ [R]Sen. Mark Allen [R]Sen. Frank Simpson [R]
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R]Rep. John Bennett [R]Rep. James Lockhart [D]Sen. Marty Quinn [R]
Rep. Donnie Condit [D]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Tom Newell [R]
Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]Rep. Emily Virgin [D]
Rep. Aaron Stiles [R]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. Glen Mulready [R]
Rep. David Brumbaugh [R]Rep. Randon Grau [R]Rep. William Fourkiller [D]Rep. Elise Hall [R]
Rep. Curtis McDaniel [D]Sen. Larry Boggs [R]Rep. Arthur Hulbert [R]Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R]
Rep. Charles McCall [R]Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R]Rep. Justin Wood [R]Sen. Jason Smalley [R]
Rep. Scott Biggs [R]Rep. Mark McBride [R]Rep. David Perryman [D]Rep. Dan Fisher [R]
Rep. Ken Walker [R]Rep. Katie Henke [R]Sen. Kevin Matthews [D]Rep. Michael Turner [R]
Sen. Kay Floyd [D]Rep. Jon Echols [R]

Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2014
2014-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-23HouseTo Senate
2014-05-23HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 0
2014-05-23HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Allen
2014-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2014-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2014-05-21SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2014-05-21SenateCCR adopted
2014-05-20SenateCCR read
2014-05-14HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
2014-05-07SenateSCs named Bass, Stanislawski, Garrison, Brown, Simpson, Branan
2014-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-04-30Senatecoauthored by Boggs
2014-04-23SenateHAs read
2014-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
2014-04-22HouseAmended
2014-04-22HouseHouse Rule suspended
2014-04-22HouseAmended
2014-04-22HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Simpson
2014-04-22HouseCoauthored by all other Representatives
2014-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2014-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2014-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2014-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2014-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2014-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2014-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-02-19Senatecoauthored by Shortey
2014-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2014-02-10Senatecoauthored by Armes (principal House author)
2014-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2014-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bass
2014-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
691698171Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
691698194Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698198Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698200Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback