OK SB1523 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Accupuncture; creating Accupuncture Committee; stating duties; authorizing licenses; stating requirements. Effective date.
Title
Accupuncture; creating Accupuncture Committee; stating duties; authorizing licenses; stating requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 6100 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 6100 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 6100 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 6100 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 6100 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |