OK SB1518 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Long-term care; eliminating temporary emergency waiver for employment of noncertified nurse aides; stating requirements for training and competency evaluation program. Effective date.
Title
Long-term care; eliminating temporary emergency waiver for employment of noncertified nurse aides; stating requirements for training and competency evaluation program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2022-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 22 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |