OK SB1518 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; authorizing designee of the Administrator of the Authority to perform certain duties. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; authorizing designee of the Administrator of the Authority to perform certain duties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 8 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Coleman |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator McCortney |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |