OK SB1507 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Self-insurance Guaranty Fund; removing certain Tax Commission notification requirement. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Self-insurance Guaranty Fund; removing certain Tax Commission notification requirement. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |