OK SB1505 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Vetoed 06/04/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

State employees; authorizing state agencies to pay employees for unused annual leave. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employees; authorizing state agencies to pay employees for unused annual leave. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-04SenateVetoed 06/04/2014
2014-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-21HouseTo Senate
2014-05-21HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2014-05-21HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Shortey
2014-05-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Wood
2014-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2014-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2014-05-21SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
2014-05-21SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2014-05-21Senatecoauthored by Christian
2014-05-20SenateCCR read, GCCA
2014-05-05SenateSCs named GCCA
2014-05-05HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2014-04-29SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-04-16SenateHAs read
2014-04-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-04-15HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-04-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2014-04-15HouseTitle restored
2014-04-15HouseAmended
2014-04-15HouseHouse Rule suspended
2014-04-15HouseGeneral Order
2014-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2014-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2014-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2014-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2014-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
2014-03-11SenateTitle stricken
2014-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2014-03-11SenateBacked up to General Order
2014-03-11SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2014-03-05SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Holt
2014-03-05SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 21
2014-03-05SenateTitle restored
2014-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2014-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2014-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2014-02-10SenateReferred to Appropriations
2014-02-10SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2014-02-06Senatecoauthored by Osborn (principal House author)
2014-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2014-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Holt
2014-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
748402Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback