OK SB1490 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highways; designating various memorial highways and bridges. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Memorial highways; designating various memorial highways and bridges. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-27 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-27 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2016-05-27 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-27 | House | House Rule suspended |
2016-05-27 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-26 | House | Ayes: 76 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-26 | House | House Rule suspended |
2016-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Transportation |
2016-05-04 | Senate | SCs named Jech, Stanislawski, Silk, Bice, Sharp, Matthews, Wyrick |
2016-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-25 | Senate | coauthored by Hickman |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1 |
2016-04-21 | House | Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders |
2016-04-21 | House | General Order |
2016-03-29 | House | Emergency added |
2016-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Wright (principal House author) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 233 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 236 | New Code | See Bill Text |