OK SB1484 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Measure failed: Ayes: 11 Nays: 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Measure failed: Ayes: 11 Nays: 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; providing for payment of portion of certain National Board certification assessment fees; modifying minimum salary schedule. Effective date.
Title
Teachers; providing for payment of portion of certain National Board certification assessment fees; modifying minimum salary schedule. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 11 Nays: 26 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by Echols |
2018-03-13 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative West (Kevin) and substitute with Representative Kannady |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 18 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |