OK SB1439 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor license agents; modifying method of selecting applicants. Effective date.
Title
Motor license agents; modifying method of selecting applicants. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 16 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 16 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18 |
2018-04-25 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-25 | House | General Order |
2018-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |