OK SB141 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB141
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State government; establishing provisions for State Capitol Preservation. Emergency.
Title
State government; establishing provisions for State Capitol Preservation. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Kirt [D] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Rep. Mike Dobrinski [R] |
Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | CCR submitted |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-18 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2023-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Kirt, Garvin, Stewart, Dugger, Hamilton, Rogers, Hicks |
2023-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2023-04-27 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-27 | House | Amended |
2023-04-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dobrinski |
2023-04-27 | House | General Order |
2023-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson |
2023-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kirt |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB141 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - CCR submitted