OK SB141 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB141

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

State government; establishing provisions for State Capitol Preservation. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; establishing provisions for State Capitol Preservation. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-25HouseCCR submitted
2023-05-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2023-05-25SenateCCR adopted
2023-05-19SenateTitle restored
2023-05-19SenateCCR read
2023-05-18HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
2023-05-11SenateSCs named Kirt, Garvin, Stewart, Dugger, Hamilton, Rogers, Hicks
2023-05-03SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2023-05-01SenateHAs read
2023-05-01HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-04-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-04-27HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2
2023-04-27HouseTitle stricken
2023-04-27HouseAmended
2023-04-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dobrinski
2023-04-27HouseGeneral Order
2023-04-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson
2023-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2023-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2023-03-27SenateEngrossed to House
2023-03-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2023-03-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-03-23SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
2023-03-23SenateTitle restored
2023-03-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2023-02-15SenateTitle stricken
2023-02-15SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-02-09SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2023-02-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2023-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Kirt
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB141 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - CCR submitted

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb141&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB141%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB141%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB141%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB141%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB141%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB141%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB141%20CCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB141%20(3-21-23)%20(KIRT)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB141%20(3-21-23)%20(KIRT)%20RT%20FA2.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB141%20FA1%20MCBRIDEMA-MAH.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB141%20FA2%20OSBURNMI-CC.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB141%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB141%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB141%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB141%20CS%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB141%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB141%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB141%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB141%20CCR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB141_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB141_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback