OK SB1406 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Paternity; providing for exception to presumption of paternity. Effective date.
Title
Paternity; providing for exception to presumption of paternity. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-05-02 | SCs named Paddack, Sykes, Russell, Burrage, Brinkley, Anderson | |
2012-05-01 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-10 | HAs read | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-09 | General Order | |
2012-04-03 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-03 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | Title restored | |
2012-03-05 | coauthored by Russell | |
2012-03-05 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-02-14 | coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author) | |
2012-02-14 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-14 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |