OK SB1398 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School building funds; expanding definition of and authorized uses for building funds; deleting requirement. Conditional effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School building funds; expanding definition of and authorized uses for building funds; deleting requirement. Conditional effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01SenateApproved by Governor 05/01/2018
2018-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2018-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 39
2018-04-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Faught
2018-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-05HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
2018-04-02HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2018-03-27HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2018-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8
2018-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Hall (principal House author)
2018-02-28SenateReported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701118New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback