OK SB1396 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to adjustment of income for purposes of determining adjusted gross income; providing for certain amount of income to be added to Oklahoma taxable income under specified circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to adjustment of income for purposes of determining adjusted gross income; providing for certain amount of income to be added to Oklahoma taxable income under specified circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: R (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: R (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/09/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-26 | To Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Motion expired | |
2010-05-26 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hickman | |
2010-05-26 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 3; Ayes: 61 Nays: 34 | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, HC's named Hickman, Pruett, Denney, McDaniel (Randy), Brannon | |
2010-04-20 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-20 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 16 | |
2010-04-19 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-19 | Amended | |
2010-04-19 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-04-12 | Title restored | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-11 | coauthored by Hickman (principal House author) | |
2010-02-11 | coauthored by Stanislawski | |
2010-02-11 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hickman | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-03 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Stanislawski | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 1354 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1354 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 205 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2385 | New Code | See Bill Text |