OK SB1382 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Voter registration; modifying requirements for cancellation of voter registrations; authorizing state membership in certain organizations. Effective date.
Title
Voter registration; modifying requirements for cancellation of voter registrations; authorizing state membership in certain organizations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Jech |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |