OK SB1382 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Boards of education; reduction of continuing education requirements for certain members. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Boards of education; reduction of continuing education requirements for certain members. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Title restored |
2014-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie) (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paddack |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |