OK SB1363 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Remove as author Senator Loveless; authored by David
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Remove as author Senator Loveless; authored by David
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; establishing compensation scheme for certain providers; defining out-of-network providers. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; establishing compensation scheme for certain providers; defining out-of-network providers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Loveless; authored by David |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Loveless |
2016-02-15 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1363&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1363%20INT.PDF |